+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole:
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: JUD
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to JUD - Antenori
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Antenori Substitute Floor amendment to the Judiciary Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Antenori Substitute Floor amendment to the Judiciary Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 11, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
January 20, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1