+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Final disposition: Held in committee of whole
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 11, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On June 10, 2009 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2009: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1