+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2009: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor