+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: failed to pass.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 11:12AM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
February 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
January 17, 2017: House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 17, 2017: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor