+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Transmit to House.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:09PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:45PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Banking and Insurance Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Banking and Insurance Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
May 8, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
February 16, 2017: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
February 9, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 17
January 17, 2017: House Banking and Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor