+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Held
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Dial
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 4:13 pmobject
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Dial Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-11 cem
Senate Fact Sheet
Dial Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
January 22, 2013: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9