+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- ED
- SUB Floor Amend to ED to Bill - Boyer - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 8:32AM.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 16, 2017: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 6, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
January 17, 2017: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor