+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- APPROP - passed
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Thorpe - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: withdrawn.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (13)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to APPROP - Thorpe - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 17, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 17, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 3, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 3
March 3, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 22
February 17, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2016: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
February 16, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 16, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor