+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 31
- Action: Signed
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:29 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 25, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 24, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2014: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3