+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
- Final reading in House: Passed
- House concurred.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Yarbrough flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to HEALTH to Bill - Boyer - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 2:14PM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
May 4, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 7
May 4, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
February 27, 2017: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 4
January 23, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 23, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor