+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: FAILED
- Representative Wilmeth motion to reconsider House Bill 2161 within 14 days. Motion passed v/v
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Kaiser - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:45PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 20
January 20, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
January 20, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8