+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 201
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:27 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendment
2-24 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 21, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 7
February 18, 2014: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 22, 2014: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor