+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 256
- Action: Signed
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmit to Senate
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- Conference committee
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Conference committee
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Aboud flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Do pass
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Senate first read
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: COM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Aboud flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
4-6 ce_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
2-28 ce
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
April 19, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
April 5, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
February 22, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
February 7, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 2, 2011: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor