+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 11, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to BI - Barto
- Amendment: BI - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: HHS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Barto Floor amendment, reference to the Banking and Insurance Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
Barto Floor amendment, reference to the Banking and Insurance Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
2160health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
June 11, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
January 20, 2009: Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2009: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor