+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 24, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 277
- Action: Signed
On June 19, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 18, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Harper flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On May 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Transmit to Senate
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to GOV - Adams
- Amendment: GOV - passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Government
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Harper Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Adams Floor amendment, reference to the Government Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Harper Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Adams Floor amendment, reference to the Government Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
4-2 gov
Senate Fact Sheet
6-26 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
June 19, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
June 18, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 9
March 24, 2008: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
March 19, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2008: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
January 15, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor