+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (12)
May 7, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
May 7, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2016: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
March 1, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
March 1, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 11
February 25, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 11
January 26, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 26, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 26, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor