+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On July 10, 2009 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 77
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gould flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: NRIPD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass amended
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Senate first read
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 11, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to NRRA - Kavanagh
- Amendment: NRRA
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- House first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Proposed Amendment
Gould Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Substitute floor amendment to the Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Commitee, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gould Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Substitute floor amendment to the Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Commitee, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2157nripd
Senate Fact Sheet
2157nripd_caucus floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2157 as passed by the senate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
July 1, 2009: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 18
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
June 12, 2009: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
June 11, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
January 20, 2009: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor