+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- HB 2157 substituted for SB 1184. Motion carried.: PASSED
- First read in Senate.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Carter motion that the House, still having possession of HB 2157, rescind its action of Thursday, February 17, 2022, whereby it passed HB2157 on Third Reading of Bills and that HB2157 be placed again under the order of business Third Reading of Bills for today.: PASSED
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Cobb - passed
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Carter motion to reconsider HB 2157 within 14 days.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
February 21, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 19
January 12, 2022: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
January 12, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor