+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 88
- Action: Signed
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment failed: Gallardo flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Reagan flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Elections: Do pass
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Elections
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to JUD - Kavanagh
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Kavanagh
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Reagan flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment; Reference to JUDICIARY Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment; Reference to JUDICIARY Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Reagan flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 9, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
March 4, 2013: Elections: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 4
January 23, 2013: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
January 23, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor