+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Osborne - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 8
January 25, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
January 25, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor