+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 14, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 207
- Action: Signed
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 12:05 pmobject
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Senate first read
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: HEALTH
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Leff Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-13 health
Senate Fact Sheet
5-21 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 9, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
April 18, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
March 7, 2007: Health: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 24, 2007: Health: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 24, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor