+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gallego #1
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gallego #2
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #1
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #2
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #3
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #4
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #5
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #6
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #7
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #8
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #9
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #10
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #11
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #12
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #13
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #14
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Cardenas #15
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Gallego to include the Gallego Floor Amend #1 to the bill
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Gallego to include the Gallego Floor Amend #2 to the bill
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Cardenas to include the Cardenas Floor Amend #1 to the bill
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Cardenas to include the Cardenas Floor Amend #14 to the bill
- Final disposition: Substituted Senate bill on third reading
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Government: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 28, 2014: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor