+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:45PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (2)
January 17, 2017: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Russell Bowers
Type:
Primary Sponsor