+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting House action on Senate amendments
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: H
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gould flr amend (ref TRANS)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref TRANS)
- Amendment adopted: TRANS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Amended by TRANS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gould Floor Amendment, reference to TRANS amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gould Floor Amendment, reference to TRANS amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
3-23 trans strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
3-29 strikermemo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-26trans corrected
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
February 12, 2007: Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
January 16, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 16, 2007: Transportation: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor