+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Financial Institutions Committee: do pass.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Financial Institutions Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - McCune Davis #1 - failed by s/v 21-30
- Floor Amend to Bill - McCune Davis #2 - failed
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:10PM.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- House Banking and Financial Services Committee: do pass.
- Referred to House Banking and Financial Services Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
Banking and Financial Services
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 17, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 17, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
February 16, 2016: Senate Financial Institutions Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 16, 2016: Financial Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 28, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 3
January 28, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 22
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 19, 2016: House Banking and Financial Services Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 19, 2016: Banking and Financial Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3