+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- WM - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Weninger - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass amended.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (6)
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Weninger - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
March 1, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 21, 2016: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor