+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe - passed
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:50AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 6, 2020: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor