+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 235 e
- Action: Signed
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On May 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Government
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
- Senate first read
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 31, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to GOV - Paton #2
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: GOV - passed as amended
- Amendment: Floor Amend to GOV - Adams - passed (SEE MOTION)
- Amendment: Floor Amend to GOV - Paton #1 - passed (SEE MOTION)
- Motion to amend 2
- Motion to amend 1
- Motion to amend 1
- Committee of the Whole:
- Motion to amend 2
- Committee of the Whole:
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 24, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Paton Floor amendment, reference to the Government Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
4-8 gov
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
May 19, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
March 31, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
March 18, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 4, 2008: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor