+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 200 w/o
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Borrelli
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Borrelli Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Borrelli Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
March 10, 2014: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
March 4, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
January 22, 2014: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor