+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 17
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CEM (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to COM - Petersen
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (16)
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Petersen Floor Amendment; Reference to COMMERCE Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 26, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
March 21, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 21, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor