+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
- House concurred.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Kavanagh flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House County and Municipal Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House County and Municipal Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
Kavanagh flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (14)
March 23, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 4
March 23, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
March 17, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
March 17, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 18, 2016: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 16, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 3
February 16, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 3
January 19, 2016: County and Municipal Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2016: House County and Municipal Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2