+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Finance: Held
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: RULES
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 13, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 13
January 20, 2009: Banking and Insurance: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 20, 2009: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor