+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
- House concurred.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Worsley flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Allen flr amend (ref TRANS) adopted
- TRANS (ref Bill) adopted
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation Committee: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (8)
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Worsley flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Allen flr amend (ref TRANS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 6, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 13
May 6, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 7
April 5, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
April 5, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2016: Senate Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2016: Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 12
March 1, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
January 19, 2016: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2016: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor