+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 19, 2023 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On June 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On June 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Mesnard flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On June 12, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
June 13, 2023: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 17
June 12, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
February 27, 2023: Senate Finance & Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 27, 2023: Senate Finance and Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 27, 2023: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 27, 2023: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 22, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 15
January 17, 2023: House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor