+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Federalism and States' Rights
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 24
January 21, 2015: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor