+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate members appointed to conference committee: PACE, BORRELLI, MARSH
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- House members appointed to conference committee: CARROLL, ANDRADE, WILMETH
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Shope flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:08PM.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:45PM.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
February 18, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 20, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 20, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor