+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 260 w/o
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Ward flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 11:45 amobject
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Water and Energy: Do pass
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Water and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture, Water and Lands
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
Ward flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 30, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 24
March 25, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2015: Water and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 12, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
January 21, 2015: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 21, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor