+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 113
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HEALTH (ref Bill)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Withdrawn
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-3 strikermemo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
3-20 health strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
7-17 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 18, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
April 10, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 20, 2007: Health: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
January 18, 2007: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 18, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor