+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate second read
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:30 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 14, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Votes (3)
February 2, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 13, 2010: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 13, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor