+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education Accountability and Reform
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 11, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2137ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
June 12, 2009: Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 11, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
January 20, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor