+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - McGuire
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:00 pmobject
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
McGuire Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
McGuire Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2136gov
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
June 16, 2009: Government Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 9
January 20, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8