+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 2, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 269
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On June 21, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On June 18, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 18 8 4 0 y passed
- Motion
- Senator harper motion to reconsider whereby failed to pass hb 2136 on third reading on april 26, 2007. motion carried.
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HEALTH (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref HEALTH)
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:00 am
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
- House second read
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-14 strikermemo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
7-12 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
3-14 health strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
June 20, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 11
May 10, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2007: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 3
February 12, 2007: Health: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
January 16, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 16, 2007: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor