+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 16, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 62 w/o
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 3:05 pm
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 3:26 pm
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Government: Withdrawn
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 14, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-29 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2010: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 8, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
January 13, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 13, 2010: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2