+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gowan
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:15 pmobject
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Gowen Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Gowen Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
January 15, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 15, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor