+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Rural and Economic Development Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Rural and Economic Development Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (12)
May 3, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
May 3, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
February 18, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 18, 2016: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 18, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 17, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 12
February 17, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 12
January 21, 2016: Rural and Economic Development: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 21, 2016: House Rural and Economic Development Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2