+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 10, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 38
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2133pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 6
June 16, 2009: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
January 20, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor