+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 315
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 26, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Allen S flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:35 pmobject
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ENV
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Environment: Do pass amended
On January 14, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Environment
House Adopted Amendment
Allen S flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Environment
House Adopted Amendment
Allen S flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-5 nripd
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 28, 2010: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2010: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
January 13, 2010: Environment: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 13, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor