+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- TAT (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Carroll - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:17PM.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
- Second read in House.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 7, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 14
April 5, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
February 18, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 10, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 8
January 14, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 14, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1