+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:45 pm
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2130jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
June 16, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
June 15, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
January 20, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor