+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- TRANS (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Financial Institutions Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation Committee: do pass amended.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Financial Institutions Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Insurance Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Insurance Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (14)
May 6, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 22
May 6, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 6
March 24, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 24, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: Financial Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2016: Senate Financial Institutions Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2016: Senate Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 23, 2016: Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2016: House Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 19, 2016: Insurance: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2